Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Vazquez Nancy Ofelia, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Berkovich Gary, Levine Marc Eric, against County Of Los Angeles, Gt Ride Llc, Local Initiative Health Authority For Los Angeles County, Logisticare Solutions Llc, Montebello Care Center Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Chu-Fujita Betty, Gilbert Kevin E., Heath Stephen Boyd, Stockalper Patrick E., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSerena R. Murillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 15, 2019 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: State of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: State of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice notice of termination or modification of stay; Filed by: GT Ride LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Nancy Ofelia Vazquez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Nancy Ofelia Vazquez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: GT Ride LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Nancy Ofelia Vazquez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 15, 2019Complaint
Date: November 15, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 15, 2019Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 03, 2019PI General Order
Date: December 04, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 27, 2019Answer
Date: December 27, 2019Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 27, 2019Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 08, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: February 06, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: February 20, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 04, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: March 04, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 13, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: March 13, 2020Association of Attorney
Date: March 25, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 01, 2020Answer - ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 01, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: April 07, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: April 14, 2020Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: June 26, 2020Answer; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant); As to: Nancy Ofelia Vazquez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Nancy Ofelia Vazquez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00; On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Nancy Ofelia Vazquez on
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Nancy Ofelia Vazquez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (LIQUIDATION);)
Date: November 25, 2020Notice - NOTICE COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (LIQUIDATION)
Date: December 08, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TERMINATION OR MODIFICATION OF STAY
Date: December 08, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: April 22, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: June 18, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: October 25, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Answer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Notice (Court Order re: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Liquidation))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Liquidation);))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice (notice of termination or modification of stay)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) ((Liquidation))
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Answer (to 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.