Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Marin Garcia Ana P, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kashani Jacob Kahen, against Nissan North America Inc A Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Stephanie M. Bowick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephanie M. Bowick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management130 days |
Filing DateOctober 24, 2019 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: October 24, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 24, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 24, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 24, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 31, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 10, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/10/2020
Date: April 10, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: July 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 31, 2020Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal
Date: October 15, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: October 15, 2020Complaint Filed by Ana P Marin Garcia (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 15, 2020Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal Filed by Clerk
Date: October 15, 2020Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Ana P Marin Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Ana P Marin Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Ana P Marin Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: October 15, 2020Notice of Settlement Filed by Ana P Marin Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Ana P Marin Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/31/2020)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/10/2020)
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.