Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fine Wendy, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Yun Edward, against Lokey Sean, U.S. Security Supply Inc., represented by O'Dell Julie W., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stuart M. Rice presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStuart M. Rice Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management121 days |
Filing DateOctober 23, 2019 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
This complaint, filed under case number 19STCV38092, has been assigned to the Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Judicial Officer Stuart Rice. The document was electronically filed by the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles on October 23, 2...
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: February 21, 2020Complaint
Date: October 23, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: October 23, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Wendy Fine (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Wendy Fine (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Sean Lokey (Defendant); U.S. Security Supply, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wendy Fine (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Wendy Fine (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Wendy Fine (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Wendy Fine (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Wendy Fine (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Wendy Fine (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Wendy Fine (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Sean Lokey (Defendant); U.S. Security Supply, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Wendy Fine (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Wendy Fine (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by Wendy Fine (Plaintiff); Wendy Fine (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Wendy Fine (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Sean Lokey (Defendant); U.S. Security Supply, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Sean Lokey (Defendant); U.S. Security Supply, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF JULIE W. O?DELL, ESQ., UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41(a)(2))
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Answer (to 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.