Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ozuna An Individual Maria Elena, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Chapman Christofer, against Mason Court Llc A Limited Liability Company, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichelle Williams Court Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions293 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Declaration Declaration; Filed by: Maria Elena Ozuna, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Maria Elena Ozuna, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Maria Elena Ozuna, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 29, 2020Case Management Statement; Filed by: Maria Elena Ozuna, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: October 23, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 23, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 20, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 06, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 21, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 21, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 30, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: January 30, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 25, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION
Date: April 27, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: April 27, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: August 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: October 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: October 29, 2020Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2020Case Management Statement Filed by Maria Elena Ozuna, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration) Filed by Maria Elena Ozuna, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Maria Elena Ozuna, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Maria Elena Ozuna, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Maria Elena Ozuna, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Maria Elena Ozuna, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of , Default Judgment) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Maria Elena Ozuna, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Maria Elena Ozuna, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Maria Elena Ozuna, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Maria Elena Ozuna, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Maria Elena Ozuna, an individual (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Judgment (Default) Filed by Maria Elena Ozuna, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/01/2020)
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...))
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment))
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment))
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment))
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.