Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Artiga Fidel, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Khousadian Alisa, Sezgin Arthur, against Barker Management Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Costanzo Sally Sellers, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with John P. Doyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn P. Doyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management95 days |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2019 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions255 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time282 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 21, 2019Complaint
Date: October 21, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: October 28, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 21, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: November 04, 2019Answer
Date: December 09, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 08, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 06, 2020Status Report
Date: April 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE)
Date: April 17, 2020Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: May 20, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: June 30, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: July 28, 2020Answer
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney
Date: May 20, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name (Notice of Disassociation of Counsel)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance))
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...))
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Continuance) of 04/17/2020)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: July 28, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: June 30, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.