Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Calderon Luis, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Connors Arthur R. Esq., against Kim Youngae Choe Trustee Of The Youngae Choe Kim Revocable Living Trust, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard J. Burdge Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 17, 2019 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time243 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 17, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 17, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 17, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: October 31, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 31, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 06, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 30, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 19, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: February 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 16, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/16/2020
Date: April 16, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: June 16, 2020Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/10/2020)
Date: June 10, 2020Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/16/2020)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: June 16, 2020Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: June 10, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.