Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Vasquez Michael, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case against Goldrich Kest Management Co. Inc., represented by Hollenbeck Linda Tracey, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Robert S. Draper presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management140 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 18, 2019 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: October 18, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 18, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 18, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 18, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: October 18, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 30, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 06, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 06, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 23, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/23/2020
Date: April 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)
Date: August 19, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 04, 2021Answer
Date: January 04, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: January 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 05, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: March 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 08, 2021Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Michael Vasquez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Michael Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: Goldrich Kest Management Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Michael Vasquez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by Goldrich Kest Management Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Michael Vasquez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Goldrich Kest Management Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: March 05, 2021Case Management Statement; Filed by: Goldrich Kest Management Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Michael Vasquez (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Michael Vasquez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Goldrich Kest Management Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Goldrich Kest Management Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Goldrich Kest Management Co., Inc. (Defendant); As to: Michael Vasquez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: March 08, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed by Goldrich Kest Management Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 03/06/2020)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference;))
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/23/2020)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.