Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Allied Roofing & Waterproofing Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Loeb Steven S, against Benchmark Contractors Inc. A California Corporation, Travelers Casualty And Surety Company Of America A Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Marc D. Gross presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarc D. Gross Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 25, 2019 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time116 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 25, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 25, 2019Complaint
Date: November 25, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 25, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 26, 2019Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: January 06, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 06, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER
Date: January 06, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 14, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: March 12, 2020Complaint
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: January 06, 2020Declaration (of Justin Ewart in Support of Application for Right to Attach Order)
Date: January 07, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order)
Date: January 06, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.