Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of America N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Sebourn Thomas J, against Hartmann Dennis, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with Elaine W. Mandel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine W. Mandel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management126 days |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time157 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 15, 2019Complaint
Date: October 15, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 15, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 18, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OSC HEARING
Date: March 06, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 17, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: March 18, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 17, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 02/18/2020)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Non Service)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 18, 2020Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Declaration (Plaintiff's Declaration In Support of OSC Hearing)
Date: March 06, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.