Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cbobanna Inc. Dba Olympic Coach Craft, Los Angeles Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Anaya Alana B, against Cbobanna Inc. Dba Olympic Coach Craft, represented by Mass Christopher L, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Elaine W. Mandel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 09, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions257 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Default entered as to Cbobanna, Inc.,; On the Complaint filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union on
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Cbobanna, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Cbobanna, Inc., (Defendant); As to: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Declaration of John Weldon in Support of Motion; Filed by: Cbobanna, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Declaration of ALANA B. ANAYA RE ATTORNEYS' FEES; Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Default entered as to Cbobanna, Inc.,; On the Complaint filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union on
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Cbobanna, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Declaration of Christopher L. Mass, Esq. in Support of Motion; Filed by: Cbobanna, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Cbobanna, Inc., (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Declaration of Anna Hyung in Support of Motion; Filed by: Cbobanna, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Does: 1-50
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 09, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 09, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 09, 2019Complaint
Date: October 09, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 09, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 18, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 22, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: November 26, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 26, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALANA B. ANAYA RE ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: November 26, 2019Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: November 26, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: January 31, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 16, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 20, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 24, 2020Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS
Date: April 24, 2020Default Judgment
Date: June 22, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: June 22, 2020Notice - NOTICE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 25, 2020Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: July 16, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN WELDON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 18, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER L. MASS, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 18, 2020Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: September 18, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANNA HYUNG IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 18, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: October 08, 2020Answer
Date: October 22, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: October 30, 2020Cross-Complaint - CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CBABANNA, INC.
Date: October 30, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 08, 2020Answer
Date: November 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT)
Date: December 15, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: January 19, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/20/2021
Date: January 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 20, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: February 17, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Set Aside D...))
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Anna Hyung in Support of Motion)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Christopher L. Mass, Esq. in Support of Motion)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (of John Weldon in Support of Motion)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Cross-Complaint (of Cbabanna, Inc.)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Declaration (of ALANA B. ANAYA RE ATTORNEYS' FEES)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice (Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.