Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Santana Maria, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Kordab Hekmat, against Healthcare Services Group Inc., Peregrina Carlos, Windsor Twin Palms Healthcare Center Llc, represented by Colby Aaron, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Margaret Miller Bernal presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMargaret Miller Bernal Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management112 days |
Filing DateOctober 03, 2019 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time155 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 03, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 03, 2019Complaint
Date: October 03, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 03, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 18, 2019Answer
Date: November 26, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 06, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 20, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 23, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 31, 2019Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER
Date: January 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 23, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Trial Setting Order
Date: January 23, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: January 23, 2020Answer
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: January 06, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 31, 2019Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.