Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Campos Arlyn Aka Arlyn Campos Moreno, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Lori Ann Fournier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLori Ann Fournier Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time64 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 15, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: October 15, 2019Petition for Change of Name
Date: October 15, 2019Decree Changing Name
Date: October 15, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: October 17, 2019Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: October 18, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: November 20, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)
Date: December 18, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Luca Armando Campos (Petitioner); Arlyn Campos (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Arlyn Campos (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Decree Changing Name; Signed and Filed by: Luca Armando Campos (Petitioner); Arlyn Campos (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name; Filed by: Luca Armando Campos (Petitioner); Arlyn Campos (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Luca Armando Campos (Petitioner); Arlyn Campos (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk
Date: December 18, 2019Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by:
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Arlyn Campos (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Decree Changing Name Filed by Luca Armando Campos (Petitioner); Arlyn Campos (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Luca Armando Campos (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Decree Changing Name
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)])
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: December 18, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.