Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tyler, Jeffrey Ryan, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Tyler, Brittany Farrah, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time26 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner Filed 12-23-19 Temporary Orders Partially Granted, Continued from 01-08-20 to be Heard with Related Case 19FL02173 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner filed 12/23/19 - Temporary Orders Granted in Part Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Temporary Restraining Order Served on Respondent | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: Lucena, Kristen A |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence Temporary Orders Granted in Part Judge: Lucena, Kristen A |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Req for Domestic Violence Rest Order - Minor Children (NF) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.