Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sanchez, Denisse, Zacatelco, Oswaldo, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Munoz, Araceli, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time35 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Reject Letter | |
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Court, Filed | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.