Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gokoffski, Andrew X, against Grames, Tina, represented by Young, Dustin A, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management169 days |
|
Filing DateJune 25, 2019 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time343 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation, Filed | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference, Filed | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver, Granted/Filed | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | General Denial, Filed | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees, Filed | |
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.