Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Santa Clara, filed a(n) Family case represented by David Scott Phillips, against Adrian A Holguin, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Family.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2019 |
CategoryFamily |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseFamily |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing: Other set per 10-27-21 mins-cc Judge: Jillian Laxton |
|
November 12, 2020 | Action |
Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS (d; otp) |
|
November 04, 2020 | Action |
Judgment: Estab Parent Relat/Supt (dcss) jgmt re parental obligations |
|
October 27, 2020 | Action | Minute Order | |
October 05, 2020 | Action |
Proof of Service: Mail s/f oah filed 9/23/2020 (def) (otp) |
|
September 23, 2020 | Action |
Short Form Order After Hearing (dcss) heard 9/8/20 |
|
September 09, 2020 | Action | Minute Order | |
September 08, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Other (no fee) (dcss) c/s; h/c; oth: default hearing and standard orders-ve; cf 9/8/20 mins CF Judge: Jillian Laxton |
|
July 07, 2020 | Action |
Proof of Service: Mail mtn (d; otp) |
|
July 01, 2020 | Action |
Notice of Motion (dcss) c/s; h/c; oth: default hearing and standard orders |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.