Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Arnold Parish, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Graham Marketha M., Pullen Sapphire Raquel, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Antelope Valley with Randolph A. Rogers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandolph A. Rogers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseAntelope Valley |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 09, 2020Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Parish Arnold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Parish Arnold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Final Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Parish Arnold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 09, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 07, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 07, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 09, 2019Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: January 31, 2020Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: March 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: March 03, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: March 25, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: September 30, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 09/30/2020
Date: September 30, 2020Order - Dismissal
Date: October 09, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: October 09, 2020Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.