Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Tsai Kimberlee, Winn Brian N., against Arakelian Varouj K Aka Varouj Arakelian, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Antelope Valley with Randolph A. Rogers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandolph A. Rogers Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2019 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions86 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseAntelope Valley |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time86 days |
Declaration re: Attorney's Fees re: Waiver of Attorney Fees; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Default entered as to VAROUJ K ARAKELIAN; On the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK, on
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Declaration Re: Underlying Action; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Default Judgment; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK, (Plaintiff); As to: VAROUJ K ARAKELIAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK, (Plaintiff)
Date: September 07, 2021Request for Dismissal; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK, (Plaintiff); As to: VAROUJ K ARAKELIAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK, (Plaintiff); As to: VAROUJ K ARAKELIAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 28, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 28, 2019Complaint
Date: May 28, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 28, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 20, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 28, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: August 01, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 20, 2019Default Judgment
Date: August 20, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: August 20, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION RE: UNDERLYING ACTION
Date: August 20, 2019Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: September 20, 2019Writ - Return
Date: August 13, 2020Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (SACRAMENTO)
Date: April 03, 2023Declaration re: Attorney's Fees (re: Waiver of Attorney Fees) Filed by DISCOVER BANK, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Complaint Filed by DISCOVER BANK, (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by DISCOVER BANK, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by DISCOVER BANK, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by DISCOVER BANK, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Writ - Return Filed by Clerk
Date: August 13, 2020Declaration (Re: Underlying Action) Filed by DISCOVER BANK, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by DISCOVER BANK, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by DISCOVER BANK, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by DISCOVER BANK, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by DISCOVER BANK, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by DISCOVER BANK, (Plaintiff)
Date: September 07, 2021Default Judgment Filed by DISCOVER BANK, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Writ - Return
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees (re: Waiver of Attorney Fees)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Declaration (Re: Underlying Action)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.