Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Perry F. Campbell, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Tammy Jo Campbell, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Sharon A. Chatman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 10, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record Legacy Name = FL Withdrawal of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 09/01/2011 |
|
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Text = stip & order Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Mail Decision = M Closed = 06/24/2011 |
|
June 15, 2011 | Hearing |
Court Trial: Short Cause
Judge: Department 71 |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Text = (p) Legacy Name = FL Stip and Order Decision = M Closed = 06/15/2011 |
|
June 06, 2011 | Hearing |
Conference: Settlement
Judge: Department 71 |
|
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = time/place of hrg; w/pos Legacy Name = FL Ntc of ... Decision = M Closed = 03/08/2011 |
|
February 22, 2011 | Hearing |
Judicial Custody Conf
Judge: Department 71 |
|
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Text = jcc... Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Mail Decision = M Closed = 02/18/2011 |
|
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
JCC Statement Legacy Name = FL JCC Statement Decision = M Closed = 02/18/2011 |
|
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Text = respondent's judicial custody conference statement/W. Hammon Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Mail Decision = M Closed = 02/14/2011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.