Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Olivares, Rosa De, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 15, 2016 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation: Unsigned, Accident, or CHP Fixit | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation: Owner Responsibility | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.