Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tuyethang Nguyen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Duc Tien Cao, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 1998 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 1999 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Legacy Name = Proof of Service Decision = M Closed = 04/22/1999 |
|
April 05, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) Legacy Name = Ntc of Entry of Jgmt [FL] Decision = M Closed = 04/13/1999 |
|
March 31, 1999 | Docket Event |
Order: Wage and Earning Assignment for Spousal Support Legacy Name = Wage & Earnings Assg Order Decision = M Closed = 03/31/1999 |
|
March 31, 1999 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Default/DS/LS Legacy Name = Decl/Default/Disso/Legal Sep/Nullity Decision = M Closed = 03/31/1999 |
|
March 31, 1999 | Docket Event |
Request Text = re custody & visitation orders pursuant to a default judgment Legacy Name = Request... Decision = M Closed = 03/31/1999 |
|
March 31, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336 Text = mse; 07/07/1999 Legacy Name = Jgmt of Dissolution by FL2336 Decl. Decision = M Closed = 04/13/1999 |
|
February 08, 1999 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed Legacy Name = Proof of Service of Summons [FL/DA/CP] Decision = M Closed = 02/08/1999 |
|
February 08, 1999 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default Legacy Name = Req to Enter Default [FL/CP] Decision = G Closed = 02/08/1999 |
|
February 08, 1999 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Legacy Name = Summons [FL] Decision = M Closed = 02/08/1999 |
|
February 08, 1999 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgement/Receipt Legacy Name = Ntc/Acknowledgment of Receipt Decision = M Closed = 02/08/1999 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.