Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Curtis Odle, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Brooks Mclain, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 1999 |
CategoryCivil Harassment |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 1999 | Docket Event |
Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record Legacy Name = Withdrawal of Atty Decision = M Closed = 08/06/1999 |
|
May 06, 1999 | Docket Event |
Other Text = NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION - FEES PAID BY RESPONDENT Legacy Name = Other [FL/DA/CP/DV]... Decision = M Closed = 05/06/1999 |
|
April 30, 1999 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV | |
April 26, 1999 | Docket Event |
Response: Petition Civil Harassment/Workplace Violence Text = RESPONDENTS ATTORNEY REFUSES TO PAY FEES AT THIS TIME Legacy Name = Resp: Pet for Inj Prohibiting Harassment Decision = M Closed = 04/26/1999 |
|
March 26, 1999 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV | |
March 05, 1999 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV | |
February 08, 1999 | Docket Event |
Notice Legacy Name = Family Law Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 02/08/1999 |
|
February 08, 1999 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Legacy Name = Proof of Service Decision = M Closed = 02/08/1999 |
|
February 05, 1999 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV | |
January 15, 1999 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.