Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Teresita Castro, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Fernando Castro, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 1998 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 1999 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Legacy Name = Request for Dismissal/Partial/WO Pre Decision = M Closed = 03/15/1999 |
|
December 24, 1998 | Docket Event |
Order Legacy Name = Appl/Order Waiving Court Fees & Costs Decision = M Closed = 12/24/1998 |
|
December 24, 1998 | Docket Event |
Petition: Dissolution w/minor Legacy Name = Pet: Dissolution of Marriage W/Minor[s] Decision = M Closed = 12/24/1998 |
|
December 21, 1998 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.