Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Scott W Lewis, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Helga A Lockwood Lewis, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 1998 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2000 | Docket Event |
Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record Legacy Name = Withdrawal of Atty Decision = M Closed = 03/21/2000 |
|
May 07, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) Legacy Name = Ntc of Entry of Jgmt [FL] Decision = M Closed = 05/10/1999 |
|
May 03, 1999 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Legacy Name = Proof of Service by Mail Decision = M Closed = 05/03/1999 |
|
May 03, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336 Text = mse: 06/25/1999 Legacy Name = Jgmt of Dissolution by FL2336 Decl. Decision = M Closed = 05/10/1999 |
|
May 03, 1999 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Default/DS/LS Legacy Name = Decl/Default/Disso/Legal Sep/Nullity Decision = M Closed = 05/03/1999 |
|
May 03, 1999 | Docket Event |
Other Text = ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RESPONDENTS PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE DOCUMENTS Legacy Name = Other [FL/DA/CP/DV]... Decision = M Closed = 05/03/1999 |
|
April 23, 1999 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default Legacy Name = Req to Enter Default [FL/CP] Decision = G Closed = 04/23/1999 |
|
April 15, 1999 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default Legacy Name = Req to Enter Default [FL/CP] Decision = D Closed = 04/15/1999 |
|
April 15, 1999 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgement/Receipt Legacy Name = Ntc/Acknowledgment of Receipt Decision = M Closed = 04/20/1999 |
|
April 15, 1999 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed Legacy Name = Proof of Service/Summons [FL/DA/CP] Decision = M Closed = 04/20/1999 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.