Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Greenleaf Distribution Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jane Z. Hinsdale, against Kwok Keung Yeung, Power Pixel Technologies Inc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 1998 |
CategoryOther Contract Unlimited (37) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: SWEET & HINSDALE HINSDALE, JANE Z. 6073 MISSION STREET DALY CITY, CA 94014-2007 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
September 30, 1999 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 9 |
|
September 02, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Satisfaction Text = MOTION Description ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FULL BY JANE HINSDALE Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
August 09, 1999 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Text = MOTION Description WRIT OF EXECUTION ISS TO SANTA CLARA CO.AGNST: POWER PIXEL/YEUNG $10097.82/ATTY. SWEET Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
August 09, 1999 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Text = MOTION Description MEMO OF CREDITS, ACCRUED INTEREST AND COST ATTY. SWEET & HINSDALE Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 25, 1999 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = MOTION Description DECL IN SUPP OF ENTRY OF JMT ATTY GARY SWEET Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 25, 1999 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Text = MOTION Description STIPULATION FOR JMT ATTY JANE HINSDALE Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 25, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment Text = MOTION Description > JMT PURS TO STIP FOR PLTF AGST DEFTS FOR TOTAL $30,854.51 BY ATTY G. SWEET - JUDGE BAINES Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 25, 1999 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = MOTION Description FIRST PAPER OF POWER PIXEL TECH. INC.; KWOK KEUNG YEUNG - STIP FOR JDGMT (ATTY HINSDALE) Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.