Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
George Khachi filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Roberta S. Hayashi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoberta S. Hayashi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 19, 1999 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: DHALIWAL & ROUHANI ROUHANI, MICHEL J. 2005 DE LA CRUZ BLVD SUITE 185 SANTA CLARA, CA 95050 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: HABBAS AMENDOLA & NASSERI HABBAS, OMAR I. CIVIC CENTER TOWER 675 NORTH FIRST ST., SUITE 100 SAN JOSE, CA 95112 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ASSOC: FRESCHI, LAW OFFICES OF MARK B. FRESCHI, MARK B. 1800 HAMILTON AVE. SUITE 240 SAN JOSE, CA 95125 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 02, 2000 | Hearing | Jury Trial after ARB Long | |
May 01, 2000 | Hearing | Hearing: Appoint Conservator Estate | |
May 01, 2000 | Hearing | Jury Trial after ARB Long | |
April 28, 2000 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = MOTION Description NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY STAY (ATTY ROUHANI) Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
April 26, 2000 | Hearing | Conference: Settlement Jury | |
October 21, 1999 | Docket Event |
Decision Text = MOTION Description NTC: JURY TRIAL AFTER A.D.R. TRUE DATE 5-1-2000 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.