Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Allan Arnold, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against County Of Santa Clara, represented by David J. Stock, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 1998 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: RANKIN LANDSNESS LAHDE SERVERIAN & STOCK STOCK, DAVID 96 NORTH THIRD STREET #500 SAN JOSE, CA 95112 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 16, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Award of Arbitrator Text = MOTION Description > JUDGMENT ON AWARD OF ARBITRATOR & NTC OF ENTRY OF JMT BY CLERK FILED Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 11, 1999 | Docket Event |
Arbitration: Other Action Text = MOTION Description PLAINTIFF'S REJECTION OF ARB AWARD & REQUEST FOR TRIAL DE NOVO (JENNINGS) ** NOT TIMELY ** Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 13, 1999 | Hearing |
Review: Arbitration Order
Judge: Department 13 |
|
May 11, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil) Text = Result Text: 146 - JUDGMENT ON AWARD OF ARBITRATOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON AWARD OF ARBITRATOR MICHAEL E. LONICH Decision = M Closed = 06/16/1999 |
|
May 11, 1999 | Docket Event |
Award: Arbitrator in favor of Defendant Text = MOTION Description AWARD OF ARBITRATOR - PLAINTIFFS CLAIM DENIED DEFT AWARDED COSTS . Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 06, 1999 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = Result Text: 853 - AWARD OF ARB RECEIVED/FILED ARBITRATION HEARING DATE (INFORMATION ONLY) PER AWARD Decision = M Closed = 05/11/1999 |
|
April 06, 1999 | Docket Event |
Decision Text = MOTION Description NTC: ARBITRATION ORDER REVIEW HEARING * NON-COMPLIANCE WITH CRC 1611/1607(C) * Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
December 22, 1998 | Hearing |
Review: Arbitration Order
Judge: OLD DEPT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.