Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lamprecht Lauren, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Donald C. Calvello, against Blake David, Taunk Madhu, Asirva-Tham Rajadurai, Benito Apolinario Pi, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Kevin E. McKenney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin E. McKenney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 1997 |
CategoryAuto Limited (22) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 1997 | Hearing | Conference: Case Management | |
September 17, 1997 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Dismissal Review; Dism Filed 9/12/97 Heard By: Judge C. Gallagher Department 34 Decision = M Closed = 09/15/1997 |
|
September 17, 1997 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Hearing Result Posting -- Date: 09/12/1997, Time: 03:00, Dept: 34, Operator: CB Bail: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Decision = M Closed = 09/17/1997 |
|
September 12, 1997 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document Received -- Comments. Description: Dwa Mail Operator: IAL Fee: $0.00 Decision = M Closed = 09/12/1997 |
|
September 12, 1997 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = Document Filed -- Dismissal of Action. Operator: SC Fee: $0.00 Comment: With Prejudice, Entire Action. Decision = M Closed = 09/12/1997 |
|
September 05, 1997 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document Received -- Comments. Description: Priority Mail Operator: RTN Fee: $0.00 Decision = M Closed = 09/05/1997 |
|
September 05, 1997 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document Received -- Comments. Description: Letter From Bernard Cotter Re: Cmc Operator: PD Fee: $0.00 Decision = M Closed = 09/05/1997 |
|
August 20, 1997 | Hearing | Conference: Case Management | |
August 20, 1997 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = Heard By: Judge R. Baines Department 34 Decision = M Closed = 08/21/1997 |
|
August 20, 1997 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Hearing Result Posting -- Date: 08/20/1997, Time: 01:30, Dept: 34, Operator: IAL Bail: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Decision = M Closed = 08/20/1997 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.