Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Kaszancis Arthur, Kaszancis Ria, filed a(n) Civil case represented by William B. Gustafson, against Massey Al, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Superior Court of Santa Clara - Civil.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 1997 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2018 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Santa Clara - Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2007 | Action |
Memorandum of Costs Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 04/05/2007 Judge: To Be Assigned |
|
April 05, 2007 | Action |
Application: Renewal Judgment Text = Renewed Judgment - $34,359.35 Legacy Name = CV Appl for Renewal of Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 04/05/2007 Judge: To Be Assigned |
|
April 05, 2007 | Action |
Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Renewal of Judgment Issued Decision = M Closed = 04/05/2007 Judge: To Be Assigned |
|
April 05, 2007 | Action |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 04/05/2007 Judge: To Be Assigned |
|
December 01, 2005 | Action |
Notice Text = change of address Legacy Name = CV Ntc of... Decision = M Closed = 12/01/2005 Judge: To Be Assigned |
|
May 07, 1997 | Action |
Notice Text = Document Filed -- Notice of. Description: Renewal Of Judgment W/Pos By Mail Operator: WAB Fee: $0.00 Decision = M Closed = 05/07/1997 Judge: To Be Assigned |
|
May 05, 1997 | Action |
Not Active Text = Complaint -- LTUK Unknown Case Type-Converted Legacy Document 1A. Dept: 03, Operator: WAB Fee: $14.00, Complaint: $13,409.64 Additional Unidentified Persons Potentially Affected: 0 Decision = M Closed = 05/05/1997 Judge: To Be Assigned |
|
May 05, 1997 | Action |
Notice Text = Document Filed -- Notice of. Description: Renewal Of Judgment Operator: WAB Fee: $0.00 Decision = M Closed = 05/05/1997 Judge: To Be Assigned |
|
May 05, 1997 | Action |
Document: Other Text = Document Noted -- Comments. Description: Previously Filed Documents Operator: WAB Fee: $0.00 Comment: All Papers Previously Filed Under Case Number Fc87008012 Now Transferred To This Case And Judgment Now Entered Pursuant To Application For And Renewal Of Judgment On File. Decision = M Closed = 05/05/1997 Judge: To Be Assigned |
|
May 05, 1997 | Action |
Not Active Text = Document Noted -- End of Case Aging. Operator: WAB Fee: $0.00 Decision = M Closed = 05/05/1997 Judge: To Be Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.