Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Theodore R Ratliff, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 1997 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 1998 | Docket Event |
Declaration and Order: Final Discharge Legacy Name = Order for Final Discharge Decision = G Closed = 01/29/1998 |
|
September 08, 1997 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Distribution (PR) Text = Robert L. Ratliff Legacy Name = receipt on final distribution signed by Decision = M Closed = 09/08/1997 |
|
September 08, 1997 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Distribution (PR) Text = Ralph W. Ratliff III Legacy Name = receipt on final dsitribution signed by Decision = M Closed = 09/08/1997 |
|
September 08, 1997 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Distribution (PR) Text = Janice Perry Legacy Name = receipt on final dist signed by Lou Decision = M Closed = 09/08/1997 |
|
September 08, 1997 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Distribution (PR) Text = R. Ratliff Jr Legacy Name = receipt on final dist signed by Theodore Decision = M Closed = 09/08/1997 |
|
September 08, 1997 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Distribution (PR) Text = Ratliff Legacy Name = receipt on final dist signed by John D. Decision = M Closed = 09/08/1997 |
|
September 08, 1997 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Distribution (PR) Text = A. De Vine Legacy Name = receipt on final dist signed by Julia Decision = M Closed = 09/08/1997 |
|
August 20, 1997 | Hearing | Hearing: Final Distribution | |
August 20, 1997 | Hearing | Reserved | |
August 20, 1997 | Docket Event |
Order: Final Distribution Legacy Name = Order for Final Distribution Decision = G Closed = 08/20/1997 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.