Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Robert Leal, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Barbara Janice Leal, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 1997 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Family Law |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 1997 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: TENNANT, ROBERT J. 1790 S. WINCHESTER BLVD. #6 CAMPBELL, CA. 95008 (408) 866-4292ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: PRO PER (000) 000-0000 Decision = M Closed = 10/18/1997 |
|
August 13, 1997 | Docket Event |
Judgment Text = MOTION Description > JUDGMENT FILED ON: 08/13/97 NOTICE FILED ON: 08/15/97, MSE: 08/18/97 Decision = C Closed = 10/18/1997 |
|
May 30, 1997 | Hearing | Request: Enter Default Judgment | |
April 22, 1997 | Hearing | Motion: In Limine | |
April 22, 1997 | Docket Event |
Other Text = MOTION Description RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (CLETS) TRO UNTIL 4-22-98. SIGNED BY JUDGE DAVILLA. Decision = C Closed = 10/18/1997 |
|
April 22, 1997 | Docket Event |
Other Text = MOTION Description STIP AND ORDER RE: MOD OF RESTRAINING ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE DAVILLA. Decision = C Closed = 10/18/1997 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.