Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Alisa Lynn Priel-Mcdonald, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Aaron Leigh Mcdonald, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 1997 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 1999 | Docket Event |
Notice: Change of Venue To Text = transferred from santa clara county to los angeles county 12/30/99 Legacy Name = Ntc re: Change of Venue To... Decision = M Closed = 12/30/1999 |
|
December 28, 1999 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing Text = acknowledgment of amended order after hrg. filed sept. 23,1999 Legacy Name = Order after Hrg [FL/CP/DV] Decision = M Closed = 12/30/1999 |
|
January 27, 1997 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.