Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Oanh Hoang Vo, filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 1997 |
CategoryOther Petition (Not Spec) Unlimited (43) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 30, 1997 | Docket Event |
Decree: Name Change Text = MOTION Description DECREE CHANGING NAME FRM JIMMY-KHANG MIHN VO TO JIMMY-KHANG MINH PHAM BY HON DANNER Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 30, 1997 | Docket Event |
Decree: Name Change Text = MOTION Description DECREE CHANGING NAME FRM OANH HOANG VO TO TATRINA-OANH HOANG PHAM BY HON DANNER Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 10, 1997 | Hearing | Hearing: OSC Name Change | |
April 14, 1997 | Docket Event |
Other Text = MOTION Description AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME (OANH HOANG VO IN PRO PER) 6/10/97 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
April 14, 1997 | Docket Event |
Other Text = MOTION Description AMENDED PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME (ATTY OANH HOANG VO IN PRO PER) Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
April 03, 1997 | Docket Event |
Other Text = MOTION Description UNDOC.ACTION RE CONFID.CLETS RPT.FRM.SHERIFF HRG.6-10=97 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
March 11, 1997 | Docket Event |
Petition (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = MOTION Description > PETITION FILED BY OANH HOANG VO Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
March 11, 1997 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Name Change Text = MOTION Description OSC RE: CHANGE OF NAME FOR 6/10/97 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
March 11, 1997 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.