Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Emma Mae Hildebrand, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Associated Anesthiologists, Dr. Rett Atkinson, Dr. Wilfred Laine, Dr. Kenneth Hui, Stanford University Medical Center, (total of 6) See All represented by Bradford J. Hinshaw, George E. Clause, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 1997 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice Unlimited (45) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: HINSHAW DRAA MARSH STILL & HINSHAW - SARATOGA HINSHAW, BRADFORD J. 12901 SARATOGA AVENUE SARATOGA, CA 95070-4162 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: ROPERS MAJESKI KOHN BENTLEY WAGNER & KANE - S.J. CLAUSE, GEORGE E. 80 NORTH FIRST STREET SAN JOSE, CA. 95113 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 10, 1997 | Hearing | Conference: Case Management | |
June 10, 1997 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = MOTION Description * CMCQ FILED 5-30-97 BY GEORGE CLAUSE Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 09, 1997 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = MOTION Description CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE QUESTIONARIE FILED BY BRADFORD J. HINSHAW Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 09, 1997 | Docket Event |
Order Text = MOTION Description ORDER GRANTING DISCOVERY MOTIONS COMM. FRISCHLING Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 06, 1997 | Hearing | Motion: Compel | |
June 06, 1997 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description > REQUEST DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE BY EMMA MAE HILDEBRAND Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 02, 1997 | Docket Event |
Motion (Family) Text = MOTION Description NTC OF MTN & MTN FOR COMPELLING RESPONSE TO CUSTOM INTEROG (ATTY BRADFORD HINSHAW) 6/6/97 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.