Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Andreas Bibl filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Calcomp Technology Inc., John Higginson, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 1997 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: BINGHAM MCCUTCHEN LLP - EPA FIELDER, ELIZABETH M. 1900 UNIVERSITY AVE. EAST PALO ALTO, CA 94303-2223 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: TOWNSEND & TOWNSEND & CREW - PALO ALTO LINZER, JOEL 379 LYTTON AVENUE PALO ALTO, CA. 94301 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
July 23, 1998 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 16 |
|
June 15, 1998 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description > REQUEST DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION SIGNED BY ATTY FR PLTF/W-P Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 19, 1998 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management after mediation
Judge: Department 16 |
|
May 19, 1998 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = MOTION Description * CMCQ FILED ON 5-8-98 BY:THEODORE T. HERHOLD *SETTLED* Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
February 19, 1998 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 16 |
|
December 11, 1997 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 16 |
|
September 04, 1997 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.