Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nakashima Nursery Co, Douglas Nakashima, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by James S. Farrar, against Cherie Christensen Professional Corp, Cherie Christensen, represented by Donald F. Farbstein, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 1997 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: FARBSTEIN & BLACKMAN FARBSTEIN, DONALD F. 1820 GATEWAY DR., STE 320 SAN MATEO, CA 94404 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: GRUNSKY EBEY FARRAR & HOWELL - WATSONVILLE FARRAR, JAMES S. 240 WESTGATE DRIVE WATSONVILLE, CA 95076 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 07, 1998 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 15 |
|
April 23, 1998 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description > REQUEST DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE BY BRUCE RICHARDSON Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
March 19, 1998 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 15 |
|
December 18, 1997 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 22 |
|
December 17, 1997 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Text = MOTION Description STIP & ORDER TO CONT. MEDIATION STATUS CONF. TO 3-19-98 BY JUDGE FOGEL Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
August 19, 1997 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 22 |
|
August 19, 1997 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = MOTION Description * CMCQ FILED 8-7-97 BY DONALD FARBSTEIN **STIP TO ARB/MEDIATION 5E & 5H** Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.