Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Golden Gate Furniture Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael K Sipes, against Pena Able, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Maureen A. Folan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 1996 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Limited(06) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter Case # on all docs for Application for and Renewal of Judgment incorrect |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter Lines 1 & 2 are incorrect. Please use the included original jgmt that has been highlighted and not the renewal of jgmt from 8-2-06 for reference because the names were spelled incorrectly on that application. |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter re: app for renewal-Line 3b is incorrect and line 4 incomplete. |
|
August 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice: Renewal of Judgment Legacy Name = CV Ntc Returned/Renewal of Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 08/09/2006 |
|
August 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Text = interest $1319.46 mailed 8-1-06 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 08/09/2006 |
|
August 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
Application: Renewal Judgment Text = $2663.01 Legacy Name = CV Appl for Renewal of Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 08/09/2006 |
|
December 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney Text = Old: Lorna Walker / New: Michael Sipes Legacy Name = Substitution of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 12/17/2004 |
|
April 09, 1997 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Text = Document Filed -- Writ of Execution Returned Unsatisfied; County of Santa Clara. Operator: JDR Fee: $0.00 Decision = M Closed = 04/09/1997 |
|
December 11, 1996 | Hearing | Conference: Case Management | |
December 11, 1996 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Hearing Result Posting -- Date: 08/09/1996, Time: 01:30, Dept: 35, Operator: DSS Bail: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Decision = M Closed = 12/11/1996 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.