Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Evelyn Richter, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) case represented by Unknown, against Park Ave Building, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 1997 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: MILLER DOMINO & ACKERMAN MILLER, ERNEST L. 1485 PARK AVENUE SUITE 100 SAN JOSE, CA 95126 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: PILLSBURY WINTHROP LLP - SAN FRANCISCO P.O. BOX 7880 SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94120-7880 (415) 983-1000 Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
March 18, 1997 | Hearing | Conference: Further Case Management | |
March 18, 1997 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = MOTION Description * CMCQ FILED 3-6-97 BY ANDREA GROSS Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
March 17, 1997 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = MOTION Description NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERV. BY THOMAS LORAN III Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
March 17, 1997 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description > REQUEST DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE BY THOMAS LORAN III Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
March 05, 1997 | Docket Event |
Other Text = MOTION Description RECEIVER'S FINAL ACCOUNTING (BY: ROBERT ROUSE, RECEIVER) Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
February 18, 1997 | Hearing | Conference: Further Case Management | |
February 18, 1997 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = MOTION Description * CMCQ FILED 2-6-97 BY ANDREA GROSS Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.