Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gianotta Paul, Gianotta Theresa, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Dancer William, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 1994 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2001 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- (Blank). Description: Copy Of Judgement Operator: NN Fee Amount: $1.00 Document Entry Noted on Register Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 12/20/2001 |
|
April 28, 1995 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- (Blank). Description: Oex 06/05/95 As To William Dancer Operator: SLM Fee Amount: $14.00 Document Issued Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 04/28/1995 |
|
April 28, 1995 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- (Blank). Description: File On Oex Desk Operator: SLM Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Entry Noted on Register Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 04/28/1995 |
|
March 21, 1995 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- (Blank). Description: Letter To Pltf=Papers Received Returned Operator: GCA Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Entry Noted on Register Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 03/21/1995 |
|
March 02, 1995 | Docket Event |
Judgment Text = Document -- Judgment Contested -- Small Claims. Operator: JFF Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed By: Commissioner Harold L. Cole -- Venue Confirmed -- Or Flag Indicated Principal And Costs: Principal: $530.00 Costs: $20.00 Total Costs: $550.00 Comment: Party Name: William Dancer Principal And Costs: Principal Amount: $0.00 Costs: $0.00 Total Costs: $0.00 Comment: None Party Name: Payment: Date: No Date, Payment Amount: $0.00 Other: Exhibits Returned To The Plaintiff By Mail. -- Mailed Date: No Date Other: Mailed Date: 03/06/1995 Legacy Name = Judgment Decision = M Closed = 03/02/1995 |
|
February 27, 1995 | Hearing | Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant | |
February 27, 1995 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- Appearance Minutes. Operator: JFF Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed By: Commissioner Harold L. Cole Party Name: Theresa Gianotta Party Name: (Not Present) Proceedings: Date: No Date, Time: No Time -- Minutes Are Recorded As Follows: Submission To Court Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 02/27/1995 |
|
February 27, 1995 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Hearing Result Posting -- Date: , Time: 01:30, Dept: 05, Operator: JFF Bail Amount: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 02/27/1995 |
|
February 27, 1995 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Sec Dep Refund/Storage Fees Heard By: Commissioner H. Cole Department 05 Decision = M Closed = 02/27/1995 |
|
December 30, 1994 | Hearing | Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.