Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Coamerica Bank Of California, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 1994 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 1997 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: HOMER & PHILLIPS PHILLIPS, GEOFFREY W. 1999 SO. BASCOM AVE. #100 CAMPBELL, CA95008 (000) 000-0000 X Decision = M Closed = 09/20/1997 |
|
February 02, 1995 | Hearing | Petition: Determine Successor | |
February 02, 1995 | Docket Event |
Order Text = MOTION Description ORDER ACCEPTING RESIGNATION OF TRUSTEE & APPTG SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE (SIGNED BY JUDGE CORDELL) Legacy Name = Order Decision = C Closed = 09/20/1997 |
|
February 02, 1995 | Docket Event |
Order Text = MOTION Description ORDER ACCEPTING RESIGNATION OF TRUSTEE & APPT SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE SIGNED JUDGE CORDELL Legacy Name = Order Decision = C Closed = 09/20/1997 |
|
January 03, 1995 | Docket Event |
Petition: Other Text = MOTION Description PROOF OF SERV/REGULAR MAIL NTC OF HRG (PROBATE) SERVE 12/30/94 Decision = C Closed = 09/20/1997 |
|
December 27, 1994 | Docket Event |
Petition: Other Text = MOTION Description > PETN OF RESIGNATION OF TRUSTEE & APPT OF SUCCES TRSTEE -COMERICA BANK-CALIF (ATTY PHILLIPS) Legacy Name = Initiating Petition for ___ Decision = C Closed = 09/20/1997 |
|
December 27, 1994 | Docket Event |
Consent Text = MOTION Description CONSENT TO APPT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE (MARION L. CORRY) Legacy Name = Consent Decision = C Closed = 09/20/1997 |
|
December 27, 1994 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing (no fee) Text = MOTION Description NTC OF HRG RE: PETN OF RESIGNATION OF TRSTEE & APPT OF SUCCESSOR TRSTEE -ATTY PHILLIPS -2/2 Legacy Name = Ntc of Hearing Decision = C Closed = 09/20/1997 |
|
December 27, 1994 | Docket Event |
Consent Text = MOTION Description CONSENT TO ACT AS TRUSTEE (JOHN KESSLER) Legacy Name = Consent Decision = C Closed = 09/20/1997 |
|
December 27, 1994 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.