Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Santa Clara, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Barbara M Camarena, against Tuan A. Vo, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 1994 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Bulk Scanned Documents | |
October 16, 1997 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: DISTRICT ATTORNEY FAMILY SUPPORT UNIT CAMARENA, BARBARA 2645 ZANKER ROAD SAN JOSE, CA. 95134 (408) 433-9600 XATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: PRO PER (000) 000-0000 Decision = M Closed = 10/16/1997 |
|
December 14, 1995 | Docket Event |
Other Text = MOTION Description REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY THE D.A. OFFICE. Decision = C Closed = 10/16/1997 |
|
November 27, 1995 | Hearing |
Motion: Judgment/Temp Ch Supp/HC/Arrear
Judge: OLD DEPT |
|
November 27, 1995 | Hearing |
Motion: Judgment/Temp Ch Supp/HC/Arrear Vacated |
|
October 24, 1995 | Hearing |
Motion: Judgment/Temp Ch Supp/HC/Arrear
Judge: OLD DEPT |
|
October 24, 1995 | Hearing |
Motion: Judgment/Temp Ch Supp/HC/Arrear Off Calendar (before hearing) |
|
December 01, 1994 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.