Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Dora Salazar, Diego Lopez Salazar, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Silvano Miracchi, against Chung-Chyi Chen, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 1994 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: MIRACCHI, LAW OFFICES OF SILVANO MIRACCHI, SILVANO 1830 THE ALAMEDA SAN JOSE, CA 95126 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
April 11, 1995 | Hearing | Conference: Case Management | |
January 30, 1995 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description > REQUEST DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE BY SILVANO MIRACCHI Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
December 16, 1994 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = MOTION Description > COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS ISSUED BY SILVANO MIRACCHI Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
December 16, 1994 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.