Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Collectronics Inc., filed a(n) Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) case represented by Stephen C. Becker, against Saru Deshpande, Cinnamon Software Inc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 1992 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: BECKER LAW OFFICE BECKER, STEVEN C. 220 MONTGOMERY ST., SUITE #388 PO BOX 192991 SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94119 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
April 27, 1994 | Docket Event |
Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record Text = MOTION Description WITHDRAWAL OF ATTY FOR DEFT. CINNAMON SOFTWARE BY NINA YABLOK. Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
February 24, 1994 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Text = MOTION Description S RET/FILED W/PRF OF SVC OF 1ST AMND S & CMPL TO CINNAMON SOFTWARE, INC. BY SUB 2/16/94 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
February 09, 1994 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Text = MOTION Description SUMMONS ISSUED ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY ATTY STEPHEN C. BECKER Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
October 27, 1993 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Text = MOTION Description STIPULATION TO VACATE JUDGMENT (S. SHAPIRO) SIGNED BY JUDGE FOGEL Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
October 20, 1993 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Text = MOTION Description RETURN ON WRIT OF EXECUTION-S. CLARA ISS 9/3/93 FOR DEBTOR CINNAMON SOFTWARE BY S. BECKER Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
September 09, 1993 | Hearing |
Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Judge: Department 4 |
|
September 09, 1993 | Hearing |
Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear Heard: Dismised |
|
September 03, 1993 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgement Text = MOTION Description ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF CREDITS AFTER JUDGEMENT BY: STEPHEN C. BECKER Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.