Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Blue Fin Technologies Inc., filed a(n) Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) case represented by Thomas J. Losavio, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 1992 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - LOW BALL & LYNCH - SAN FRANCISCO LOSAVIO, THOMAS J. 505 MONTGOMERY STREET, 7TH FL. SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94111-2584 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
March 11, 1993 | Hearing |
Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Judge: Department 4 |
|
February 09, 1993 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description DISMISSAL WPE BY THOMAS LOSAVIO Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
December 29, 1992 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 4 |
|
June 03, 1992 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
June 03, 1932 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = MOTION Description CMC COMPLAINT BY THOMAS J. LOSAVIO Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.