Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Robert Hardy Jr., filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Superior Court of Santa Clara - Civil.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 15, 1992 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2018 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Santa Clara - Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Action |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 Judge: To Be Assigned |
|
February 09, 1993 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management Text = Reason Text: 317 - DISMISSED ENTIRE ACTION CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/COMPLAINT Judge: Inactive Judge |
|
August 17, 1992 | Action |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description DISMISSAL WP ENTIRE ACTION BY S. SEABAUGH Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 Judge: To Be Assigned |
|
July 15, 1992 | Action |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = MOTION Description CMC COMPLAINT BY SCOTT SEABAUGH Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 Judge: To Be Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.