Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mehdi Mohammadian, Master Construction Co. Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 1993 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - DEUTSCH, LAW OFFICES OF MARTIN DEUTSCH, MARTIN 440 NORTH FIRST ST., SUITE 200 SAN JOSE, CA 95112 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 27, 1993 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 2 |
|
May 20, 1993 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description DISMISSAL WP ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MARTIN DEUTSCH Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
March 18, 1993 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 2 |
|
February 18, 1993 | Hearing |
Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Judge: Department 2 |
|
January 12, 1993 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 2 |
|
June 19, 1992 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
June 19, 1992 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = MOTION Description CMC COMPLAINT BY MARTIN DEUTSCH Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.