Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Schaaf, Eric Todd, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2016 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
September 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
September 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Bail Forfeiture | |
September 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation | |
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.