Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Freeman Ralph, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by William Howard Kochenderfer, against Biggs Mark, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 18, 1991 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Limited (23) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 1999 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document Noted -- Comments. Description: Case Purged Operator: YIH Fee: $0.00 Decision = M Closed = 03/30/1999 |
|
April 29, 1992 | Hearing | Hearing: Motion hearings | |
April 29, 1992 | Docket Event |
Motion: Other Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Cmc Heard By: Judge W. Kinder Department 36 Decision = M Closed = 04/15/1992 |
|
September 18, 1991 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Complaint -- 23LT Personal Injury-Converted Legacy Document 1A. Dept: Unspecified, Operator: Fee: $0.00, Complaint: $0.00 Summons Issued Decision = M Closed = 09/18/1991 |
|
September 18, 1991 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.