Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kerri O. Weathington, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 1991 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice Unlimited (45) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
July 02, 1997 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney Text = MOTION Description SUBSTITUTION OF ATTY FOR PLTFF. WEATHINGTON OLD: (DRALLA NEW: (WEATHINGTON (PP) Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 30, 1992 | Hearing | Conference: Case Management | |
May 12, 1992 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Text = MOTION Description STIPULATION & ORDER TO STAY ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION BY JUDGE FOGEL Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
December 06, 1991 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 06, 1991 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = MOTION Description CMC COMPLAINT FILED BY JOHN TYNDALL III Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.