Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
David M. Garza, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Minh Van Trinh, represented by Bernard P. Lahde, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 1991 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - RANKIN LANDSNESS LAHDE SERVERIAN & STOCK LAHDE, BERNARD P. 96 NORTH THIRD STREET #500 SAN JOSE, CA 95112 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
March 02, 1993 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 4 |
|
March 02, 1993 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management Off Calendar by court |
|
March 02, 1993 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney Text = MOTION Description SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYS FOR JAMES ONO OLD: JAMES ONO NEW: PP (408)280-1828(MESSAGE) Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
February 24, 1993 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = MOTION Description ** CMC FILED 02/23/93;BY KATHLEEN K. GOULD, ESQ. Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
February 22, 1993 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = MOTION Description ** CMC FILED 02-18-93;BY DAVID MENA GARZA Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
January 15, 1993 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = MOTION Description ** AWARD FILED 12-18-92 $804.16 REJECTED BY PLTF./ARB BRIAN C. GORDENEV Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
January 15, 1993 | Docket Event |
Rejection: Arbitration Award by Plt Text = MOTION Description REJECT ARB AWARD/REQUEST TRIAL DE NOVO BY PLAINTIFF: JAMES N. ONO Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
December 18, 1992 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = Result Text: 852 - ARBITRATION REJECTED AWARD OF ARBITRATOR Decision = M Closed = 01/15/1993 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.